Chancellor Jim Meznek hired the following professional experts:
Jay R. Anderson, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective May 23, 2005 – June 30, 2005
Anthony Arellanes, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective May 23, 2005 – June 30, 2005
Anthony Arellanes, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Steve Barton, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Larry Brister, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Steven Carroll, Health Care Professional, Ventura College, effective June 11, 2005 – June 11, 2005
James Clegg, Health Care Professional, Ventura College, effective June 11, 2005, 2005 – June 11, 2005
Jessica Cochran, Health Care Professional, Ventura College, effective June 11, 2005 – June 11, 2005
Anna Cole, Health Care Professional, Ventura College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Phillip Corsi, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Robert Dunivin, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Erik Fest, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Deanna Flanagan, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Sharon Gibbs, Health Care Professional, Moorpark College, effective August 8, 2005 – December 14, 2005
Daniel Gildea, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Morley R. Hense, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective May 23, 2005 – June 30, 2005
Joseph Herrick, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
John Huecker, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
James Krebs, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective May 13, 2005 – June 30, 2005
James Krebs, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
David Kromka, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective May 23, 2005 – June 30, 2005
David Kromka, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Jerry Lara, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Jerry Lund, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Glenn A. Peters, Health Care Professional, Moorpark College, effective July 1, 2005 – December 15, 2005
Steven Reyes, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective May 23, 2005 – June 30, 2005
Steven Reyes, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Brian Porter, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Deborah Sargent, Health Care Professional, Moorpark College, effective July 1, 2005 – December 14, 2005
Mark Seastrom, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Daniel Sherman, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Brian Southerland, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Dan Spykerman, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
John E. Squire, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Denise Stephenson, Health Care Professional, Moorpark College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Lisa Tarkany, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Christina Terrazas, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Mark Todd, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006
Gary Young, Occupational Trainer, Oxnard College, effective July 1, 2005 – June 30, 2006